IL SB0562 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that the Environmental Protection Agency may establish a take back program for local fire departments that use and store older firefighting foam made with perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances, also known as PFAS. Effective immediately.
Title
EPA-PFAS TAKE BACK PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Re-assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=562&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0562.htm |