IL SB0516 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Drug Reuse Opportunity Program Act. Provides that, notwithstanding any other law or rule, donors may donate drugs to recipients and recipients may receive donated drugs from donors. Provides that recipients shall only dispense or administer drugs to eligible patients, further donate drugs to another recipient, or dispose of drugs in accordance with specified provisions. Provides that drugs donated for use under the Act are considered nonsalable. Provides that, when dispensing a drug to an eligible patient, the recipient must do so at no cost to the eligible patient, except that a reasonable handling fee may be charged. Provides that recipients may only dispense or administer a prescription drug or provide an over-the-counter drug if specified requirements are met. Provides that recipients shall, to the greatest extent practicable, dispense drugs received under the Act to priority patients. Provides that drugs may be accepted under the Act only if specified requirements are met. Contains requirements for the further donation of drugs by a recipient. Contains provisions regarding the disposition of specified drugs. Provides that nothing in the Act requires that a pharmacy or pharmacist be a recipient of drugs under the Act. Provides that the Act shall supersede any inconsistent law or rule for activities conducted under the Act. Contains other provisions. Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act, the Wholesale Drug Distribution Licensing Act, the Senior Pharmaceutical Assistance Act, the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act, the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, and the Cannabis and Controlled Substances Tort Claims Act to provide that persons engaged in donating or accepting, or packaging, repackaging, or labeling, prescription drugs to the extent permitted or required under the Illinois Drug Reuse Opportunity Program Act are exempt from provisions of those other Acts that might prohibit or otherwise regulate such activity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PRESCRIPTION DRUG REPOSITORY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-23SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-04-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Health; 013-000-000
2021-04-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-04-20SenateWaive Posting Notice
2021-04-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Health
2021-04-20SenateRe-assigned to Health
2021-04-20SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021
2021-04-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-04-16SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-04-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
2021-04-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2021-04-14SenateTo Subcommittee on Public Health
2021-04-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Public Health
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health
2021-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
2021-04-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-04-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
2021-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
2021-04-07SenateAssigned to Health
2021-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2021-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2021-04-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2021-04-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-03-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
2021-03-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
2021-03-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2021-02-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2021-02-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
2021-02-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22512015Amended CodeCitation Text
225854Amended CodeCitation Text
3205010Amended CodeCitation Text
41062016Amended CodeCitation Text
720570102Amended CodeCitation Text
740203Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback