IL SB0516 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0908
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0908
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Service Use Tax Act. Makes a technical change concerning stating the tax as a distinct item.
Title
SCH CD-DISTRICT-IMPACT AID
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 81 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 81 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0908 |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Effective Date December 16, 2016 |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2016-12-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000 |
2016-12-01 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2016-12-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 011-000-000 |
2016-11-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education |
2016-11-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-11-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - December 1, 2016 |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-11-30 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-11-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 081-030-000 |
2016-11-30 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2016-11-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-30 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-11-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-003-000 |
2016-11-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-11-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-11-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-11-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2016-11-14 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-06-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-16 | House | First Reading |
2016-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-05-13 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-05-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-016-000 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Clayborne |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 008-002-000 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Revenue |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 110 | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |