IL SB0496 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires the State Board of Education to establish grade level endorsements to be added to the Professional Educator License in the categories of: (i) Elementary (grades K through 9); and (ii) Secondary (grades 6 through 12). Provides for the adoption of rules regarding requirements for obtaining grade level endorsements. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-GRADE LEVEL ENDORSEMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |