IL SB0468 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-25 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Safety Drill Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDUCATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
2024-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
2024-05-16SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
2024-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2024
2024-05-16SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2023-03-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2023-03-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
2023-03-10SenateSecond Reading
2023-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
2023-03-09SenateDo Pass Executive; 011-000-000
2023-03-02SenateAssigned to Executive
2023-02-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-02-02SenateFirst Reading
2023-02-02SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1051281Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback