IL SB0463 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
Pending: House Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:00 pm in Room 115
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
Pending: House Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:00 pm in Room 115
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Employment of Teachers Article of the School Code. With regard to the Section concerning contractual continued service, removes provisions specifying that the probationary periods are only for service in which a teacher holds a Professional Educator License. Amends the Evaluation of Certified Employees Article of the Code. Provides that on July 1, 2024, the State Superintendent of Education shall convene a Performance Evaluation Advisory Committee for the purpose of maintaining and improving the State evaluator training and pre-qualification program in this State. Provides that the Committee shall be staffed by the State Board of Education. Sets forth the membership of the Committee. Provides that members of the Committee shall be nominated by program providers and appointed by the State Superintendent. Provides that the Committee shall meet initially at the call of the State Superintendent and shall select one member as chairperson at its initial meeting. Provides that the Committee shall meet at least quarterly and may also meet at the call of the chairperson of the Committee. Provides that the Committee shall advise the State Board of Education on the continued implementation of the evaluator training and pre-qualification program in this State, which may include the development and delivery of the program's existing and new administrators' academies, gathering feedback from program instructors and participants, sharing best practices, consulting with the State Board on any proposed rule changes regarding evaluator training, and other subjects as determined by the chairperson of the Committee. Effective June 15, 2024.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-000 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 014-000-000 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2024 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 70 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |