IL SB0444 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-31 - Sponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-31 - Sponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Breakfast and Lunch Program Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning applications.
Title
STUDENT ONLINE PROTECTION ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] |
Rep. Avery Bourne [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - Motion in House (Y: 90 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-09 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 42 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-09 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 42 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0578 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Effective Date January 31, 2018 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Amendatory Veto Overridden Both Houses |
2018-01-31 | House | Override Amendatory Veto - House Passed 090-018-000 |
2018-01-31 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-01-31 | House | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. William Davis |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto January 31, 2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 038-017-000 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto January 31, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2017-11-09 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 042-011-000 |
2017-11-09 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-11-09 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-11-09 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-09 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - November 9, 2017 |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 |
2017-11-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2017-11-08 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-11-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-11-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2017-11-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. William Davis |
2017-11-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. William Davis |
2017-11-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-11-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-11-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-11-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-11-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2017-11-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 014-000-000 |
2017-10-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2017-10-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2017-08-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-08-28 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis |
2017-08-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-08-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2017-08-28 | House | Legislation Considered in Special Session No. 15 |
2017-08-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 31, 2017 |
2017-08-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-08-28 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 010-001-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 066-050-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-28 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-020-000 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Clayborne |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-004-000 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 125 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |