IL SB0317 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-4)
Status: Vetoed on February 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on February 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
ILLINOIS STATE MUSEUM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Senate | Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Lost 032-015-000 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto February 16, 2016 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-11-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 082-032-000 |
2015-11-10 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-11-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2015-11-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-11-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-10-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015 |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-10-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-09-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015 |
2015-09-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-09-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-09-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-09-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2015-09-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-09-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-09-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-09-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Museums, Arts, & Cultural Enhancement Committee; 006-002-000 |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2015-08-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015 |
2015-08-25 | House | Assigned to Museums, Arts, & Cultural Enhancement Committee |
2015-08-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015 |
2015-08-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2015-08-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-08-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-08-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-08-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-08-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2015-08-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-08-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-08-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2015-08-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-08-05 | House | First Reading |
2015-08-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2015-08-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-009-005 |
2015-08-04 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-005-000 |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As August 5, 2015 |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2015-08-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2015-07-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2015-07-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2015-07-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |