IL SB0316 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-15 - Third Reading - Lost; 032-000-022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-15 - Third Reading - Lost; 032-000-022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Open Meetings Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning definitions.
Title
GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 27 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Lost; 032-000-022 |
2015-07-15 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; J. Cullerton |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Cullerton |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-003 |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 009-005-002 |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As July 1, 2015 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 120 | 1.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |