IL SB0314 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0395
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0395
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Installment Loan Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning a license required to engage in the business of making loans of money in a principal amount not exceeding $40,000.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0395 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2017-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-05 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Murphy |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 010-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 670 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |