IL SB0314 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0395
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Consumer Installment Loan Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning a license required to engage in the business of making loans of money in a principal amount not exceeding $40,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0395
2017-08-25SenateEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-25SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-05HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-05-03HouseArrived in House
2017-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Murphy
2017-05-02SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 010-000-000
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2017-03-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-03-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2056701Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback