IL SB0303 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Native American Gaming Compact Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOTTERY-END OF ALZHEIMER'S

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-03HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-01-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2016-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2016-11-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-004-000
2016-11-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-004-000
2016-11-29HouseRemains in Revenue & Finance Committee
2016-11-29HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-001-000
2016-11-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2016-11-28HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
2016-11-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-11-22HouseTo Finance Subcommittee
2016-11-22HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2016-06-30HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
2016-05-27HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
2016-05-13HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
2016-05-12HouseTo Finance Subcommittee
2016-05-09HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2016-04-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-04-22HouseFirst Reading
2016-04-22HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2016-04-22HouseArrived in House
2016-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-001-000
2016-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2016-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush
2016-04-21SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2016-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-001
2016-04-16SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Melinda Bush
2016-04-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
2016-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2016-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2016-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2016-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2016
2016-04-06SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2015-04-21SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2015-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015
2015-04-15SenateSecond Reading
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
2015-03-26SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2015-03-18SenateAssigned to Executive
2015-01-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-01-28SenateFirst Reading
2015-01-28SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
230351Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback