IL SB0295 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0090
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0090
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Intergenerational Poverty Act. Provides that the Commission on Poverty Elimination and Economic Security shall have 2 members of the judiciary (rather than a member of the judiciary or a designee) who shall be appointed by the Chief Justice of the Illinois Supreme Court. Effective immediately.
Title
COMMISSION ON POVERTY-MEMBERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0090 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Effective Date July 9, 2021 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 111-000-000 |
2021-05-14 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 007-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 70 | 95-501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |