IL SB0262 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Aid Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois and the State Finance Act. Creates the Hunger Relief Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that, from appropriations to the Department of Healthcare and Family Services from the Fund, the Department shall make grants to members of the Illinois Food Bank Association for the purpose of making capital improvements, purchasing food, or acquiring other assets. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-GRANTS-HUNGER RELIEF
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. James Clayborne [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Gary Forby [D] |
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. Ira Silverstein [D] | Sen. Heather Steans [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-06-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-06-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2009-06-30 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-06-30 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2009-06-24 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2009-06-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-06-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-06-01 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-06-01 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-05-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-31 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 | |
2009-05-31 | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-05-31 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-031-000 | |
2009-05-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000 | |
2009-05-31 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2009-05-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. | |
2009-05-27 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-27 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-27 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 | |
2009-05-27 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-27 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee | |
2009-05-26 | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-26 | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-05-26 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-05-26 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Biggins | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-05-11 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Susana A. Mendoza | |
2009-05-08 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-07 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2009-05-07 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke | |
2009-05-07 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Annazette Collins | |
2009-05-07 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah L. Graham | |
2009-05-06 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-05-05 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2009-04-30 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-04-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2009-04-20 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2009-04-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-06 | First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-04-03 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2009-04-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2009-04-02 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-04-02 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2009-04-02 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2009-04-01 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 2, 2009 | |
2009-03-23 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2009 | |
2009-03-19 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-13 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby | |
2009-03-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2009 | |
2009-03-06 | Do Pass as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-03-02 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-02 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-04 | First Reading | |
2009-02-04 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland |