IL SB0250 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-08 - Item/Reduction Veto Stands 103-0006
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-08 - Item/Reduction Veto Stands 103-0006
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Public Act 102-698 by changing, adding, and repealing various FY 2023 appropriations. Makes FY 2024 appropriations and reappropriations for specified purposes. Some provisions are effective immediately; some provisions are effective July 1, 2023.
Title
$FY24 APPROPRIATIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-08 | Senate | Item/Reduction Veto Stands 103-0006 |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Reduction Veto October 25, 2023 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Governor Item/Reduction Veto PA 103-0006; With Appropriation Items Reduced |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Effective Date July 1, 2023; Some Provisions |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Effective Date June 7, 2023; Some Provisions |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-038-000 |
2023-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-004-000 |
2023-05-26 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 070-037-000 |
2023-05-26 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |
2023-05-26 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2023-05-26 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2023 |
2023-05-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2023-05-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-25 | House | First Reading |
2023-05-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2023-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 034-022-000 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Sims |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Approved For Consideration Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (d-10) |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Sims |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Do Pass Appropriations; 009-004-000 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |