IL SB0231 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-29 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-29 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that if a person who is incarcerated in a jail or correctional facility in Illinois or receiving treatment at a hospital under the authority of the Department of Corrections was a recipient of medical assistance immediately before his or her incarceration or period of treatment, the recipient shall remain eligible for medical assistance during the period of his or her incarceration or treatment, but the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall not provide medical assistance for any medical care, services, or supplies provided to the recipient during that period. Provides that the Department may, however, provide medical assistance for inpatient hospital services provided to the recipient at a hospital located outside the premises of the jail or correctional facility to the extent that federal financial participation is available for the costs of those services. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-PRISONER-ELIGIBILITY
Sponsors
Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 83 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-29 | Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto | |
2009-10-14 | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 15, 2009 | |
2009-07-24 | Governor Amendatory Veto | |
2009-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-04-28 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-04-28 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 083-033-000 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-22 | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-02 | First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-02-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2009 | |
2009-02-27 | Second Reading | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 26, 2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 008-000-000 | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services | |
2009-02-24 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-24 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2009-02-19 | Postponed - Human Services | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-04 | First Reading | |
2009-02-04 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |