IL SB0229 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-09 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the purpose of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STUDENT ONLINE PERS PROTECTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2016-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2016-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks
2016-05-10HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2016-05-10HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2016-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2016-04-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-04-22HouseFirst Reading
2016-04-22HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks
2016-04-22HouseArrived in House
2016-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2016-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2016-04-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2016-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2016-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hastings
2016-04-21SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2016-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000
2016-04-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado
2016-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2016-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2016-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2016-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2016-04-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2016-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2016-03-17SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2016-03-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2016-03-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2016-03-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2016-03-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2016-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 9, 2016
2016-03-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2015-04-21SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2015-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015
2015-04-15SenateSecond Reading
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
2015-03-26SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2015-03-18SenateAssigned to Executive
2015-01-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-01-28SenateFirst Reading
2015-01-28SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11551Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback