IL SB0212 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0613
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0613
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Sexually Transmissible Disease Control Act. Adds definitions for "health care professional" and "expedited partner therapy". Provides that the Department of Public Health shall provide information and technical assistance as appropriate to health care professionals who provide expedited partner therapy services for persons with sexually transmissible diseases. Provides that a health care professional who makes a clinical diagnosis of chlamydia or gonorrhea may prescribe, dispense, furnish, or otherwise provide prescription antibiotic drugs to the infected person's sexual partner or partners without physical examination of the partner or partners, if in the judgment of the health care professional, the partner is unlikely or unable to present for comprehensive health care. Provides that the health care professional shall provide counseling for the patient and written materials to be given by the patient to the partner or partners. Provides that a health care professional providing expedited partner therapy in good faith without fee or compensation and providing counseling and written materials shall not be subject to civil or professional liability, except for willful and wanton misconduct. Makes other changes.
Title
PB HLTH-SEXUALLY TRANS DISEASE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-27 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-24 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0613 | |
2009-08-24 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-24 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-27 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-003-000 | |
2009-05-26 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Public Health; 006-000-000 | |
2009-05-22 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Public Health | |
2009-05-15 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-15 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 14, 2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-05-13 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-004-000 | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke | |
2009-05-11 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto | |
2009-05-11 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2009-05-11 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2009-05-11 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-05-11 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William D. Burns | |
2009-05-05 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-05-05 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar | |
2009-05-05 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris | |
2009-05-05 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard | |
2009-05-05 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-04-24 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-04-24 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-22 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 006-001-000 | |
2009-04-22 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-04-22 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-02 | First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-02 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 048-006-000 | |
2009-04-02 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2009-04-02 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-03-30 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2009-03-19 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health | |
2009-03-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2009-03-18 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2009-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2009 | |
2009-03-05 | Do Pass Public Health; 009-001-000 | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to Public Health | |
2009-02-05 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2009-02-04 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-02-04 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2009-02-03 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado | |
2009-02-03 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-03 | First Reading | |
2009-02-03 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |