IL SB0191 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Arrived in House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Prohibits the possession of any product consisting of or containing powdered alcohol. Provides that a knowing violation of that prohibition is a Class A misdemeanor for a first offense and a Class 4 felony for a second or subsequent offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR-POWDERED ALCOHOL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-01-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-18SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-18SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23556-34.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback