IL SB0190 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Personnel Code. Provides that if an agency requests an open competitive eligible list from the Department of Central Management Services, the Director or Central Management Services shall also provide to the agency a Successful Disability Opportunities Program eligible candidate list. Effective immediately.
Title
PERSONNEL CD-ELIGIBILITY LISTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0192 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 415 | 8b.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |