IL SB0175 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that if employee contributions are picked up or made by the Employer or the Board of Trustees of the Fund (instead of the Board of Education) on behalf of its employees, then the amount of the employee contributions which are picked up or made in that manner shall not be deducted from the salaries of such employees.
Title
PEN CD-CTPF-CONTRIBUTIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Postponed - Pensions |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 17-131 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=175&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0175.htm |