IL SB0156 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-23 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-23 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Trusts and Trustees Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Act's short title.
Title
LAW ENFORCEMENT DISP PROPERTY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2015-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2015 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Muñoz |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
760 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |