IL SB0153 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that each school board employing an employee who is an elected trustee of the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund shall make available to the elected trustee at least 20 days of paid leave of absence per year for the purpose of attending meetings of the Fund's Board of Trustees, committee meetings of the Board, and seminars regarding issues for which the Board is responsible. The Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund shall reimburse affected school districts for the actual cost of hiring a substitute employee during such leaves of absence. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-RETIREMENT TRUSTEE LEAV
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-06 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2009-04-30 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2009-04-30 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2009-04-30 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2009-04-30 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro | |
2009-04-30 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-04-30 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ronald A. Wait | |
2009-04-30 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto | |
2009-04-30 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-04-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-06 | First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-001 | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Garrett | |
2009-03-25 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-03-19 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 010-000-000 | |
2009-03-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education | |
2009-03-04 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs | |
2009-02-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2009 | |
2009-02-27 | Second Reading | |
2009-02-27 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2009-02-19 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-19 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2009-02-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 18, 2009 | |
2009-02-11 | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Education | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-01-30 | First Reading | |
2009-01-30 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett |