IL SB0146 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Finance Act, Counties Code, Illinois Municipal Code, Metro-East Park and Recreation District Act, Local Mass Transit District Act, Regional Transportation Authority Act, and Water Commission Act of 1985. Provides that the amounts transferred into the Tax Compliance and Administration Fund shall be reduced from 1.5% to 1%. Effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TAX COMPLIANCE FUND-TRANSFER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-06SenatePostponed - Revenue
2019-02-21SenatePostponed - Revenue
2019-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Revenue
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-29SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-29SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301056z-20Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1006Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1006.5Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1007Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-11-1Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-11-1.3Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-11-1.4Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-11-1.6Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-11-1.7Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-11-5Amended CodeCitation Text
70160530Amended CodeCitation Text
7036105.01Amended CodeCitation Text
7036154.03Amended CodeCitation Text
7037204Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback