IL SB0119 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0078
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0078
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as Hayli's Law. Amends the Food Handling Regulation Enforcement Act. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of law, the Department of Public Health, the health department of a unit of local government, or a public health district may not regulate the sale of lemonade or nonalcoholic drinks or mixed beverages by a person under the age of 16. Effective January 1, 2022.
Title
FOOD HANDLING-LEMONADE STANDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0078 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Consumer Protection Committee; 006-000-000 |
2021-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 16, 2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2021 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass Tourism and Hospitality; 007-000-000 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Postponed - Tourism and Hospitality |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Assigned to Tourism and Hospitality |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |