IL SB0115 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-9)
Status: Passed on August 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0555
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-9)
Status: Passed on August 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0555
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Open Meetings Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0555 |
2013-08-27 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2013-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Josh Harms |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2013-05-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 015-000-000 |
2013-05-28 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2013-05-28 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-05-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-23 | House | First Reading |
2013-05-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2013-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Mulroe |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 120 | 1.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |