IL SB0104 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF), Cook County, State Employees, State Universities, Downstate Teachers, and Chicago Teachers Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. For participants who first become participants on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, prohibits (i) payments for unused sick or vacation time from being used to calculate pensionable earnings and salary and (ii) unused sick or vacation time from being used to establish service credit. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-SALARY-NO SICK/VACATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-02-19 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 14-104.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-112 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-113.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-127 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-116 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-134 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-114 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-116 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-139 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 9-219 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 9-220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=104&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0104.htm |