IL SB0100 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-3)
Status: Passed on August 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0456
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-3)
Status: Passed on August 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0456
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the School Code's construction.
Title
SCH CD-STUDENT DISCIPLINE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 43 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0456 |
2015-08-24 | Senate | Effective Date September 15, 2016 |
2015-08-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs 043-011-001 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 043-011-001 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 009-000-000 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education |
2015-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 22, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2015-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-041-000 |
2015-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2015-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2015-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2015-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2015-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2015-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-13 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 017-005-000 |
2015-05-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2015-05-04 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2015-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2015-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2015-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2015-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2015-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-016-000 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Lightford |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 008-003-000 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 009-005-000 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |