IL SB0092 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Drainage Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning names of districts.
Title
CNTY CD-JOINT REGIONAL PLAN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-29 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 31 N: 21 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-01-14 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-11-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Lost 031-021-000 |
2011-11-29 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2011-11-10 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 009-003-000 |
2011-11-10 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2011-11-10 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2011-11-09 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government |
2011-11-09 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2011-11-09 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - November 10, 2011 |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2011-11-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-043-000 |
2011-11-09 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2011-11-09 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. |
2011-11-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-11-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-11-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-003-000 |
2011-11-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-11-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-11-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-11-07 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-10-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-06 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-10-06 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2011 |
2011-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 006-000-000 |
2011-04-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2011-04-25 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. |
2011-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2011-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Koehler |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2011 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 605 | 3-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |