IL SB0091 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-27 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-27 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fox Waterway Agency Act. Makes a technical change concerning the Agency's programs.
Title
FOX WATERWAY AGENCY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-27 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto October 25, 2011 |
2011-08-05 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2011-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000 |
2011-04-25 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2011-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2011 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Althoff |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2011-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2011 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
615 | 90 | 7.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |