IL SB0090 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act, Counties Code, Illinois Municipal Code, Metro-East Park and Recreation District Act, Local Mass Transit District Act, Regional Transportation Authority Act, and Water Commission Act of 1985. Provides that the amounts transferred into the Tax Compliance and Administration Fund shall be reduced from 1.5% to 1%. Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
TAX COMPLIANCE FUND-TRANSFER
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 6z-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1006.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1006.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1007 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 1605 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3610 | 5.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3615 | 4.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3720 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=90&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0090.htm |