IL SB0068 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - Third Reading - Lost; 019-035-001
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - Third Reading - Lost; 019-035-001
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that the employment discrimination Article of the Act applies to domestic workers. Amends the Minimum Wage Law. Provides that the overtime provisions of the Law apply to domestic workers. Amends the One Day Rest In Seven Act. Provides that every person employed as a domestic worker shall be allowed at least 24 consecutive hours of rest in every calendar week. Provides that a domestic worker may voluntarily agree to work on such day of rest; provided that the worker is compensated at the overtime rate for all hours worked on such day of rest. Provides that the day of rest should, whenever possible, coincide with the traditional day reserved by the domestic worker for religious worship. Provides that after one year of work with the same employer a domestic worker shall be entitled to at least 3 days of rest in each calendar year at the regular rate of compensation.
Title
DOMESTIC WORKERS-RIGHTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 19 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Lost; 019-035-001 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 006-004-000 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Postponed - Labor |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Held in Labor |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Held in Labor |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 2-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 105 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 105 | 4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 140 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |