IL SB0067 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that a school building may not be used as a polling place if such a use is impossible or inconvenient as determined by a vote of the school board controlling the school building (rather than requiring a school district to make a school available as a polling place if the county board or board of election commissioners chooses a school to be a polling place). Amends the School Code. Provides that every school board may (rather than shall) offer to the appropriate officer or board having responsibility for providing polling places for elections the use of any and all buildings under its jurisdiction for any and all elections to be held, if so requested by such appropriate officer or board.
Title
ELEC CD-SCHOOL POLLING PLACE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 11-4.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 22-21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=67&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0067.htm |