IL SB0064 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that a person commits false personation when he or she falsely represents himself or herself: to be another person and does an act in such assumed character with intent to obtain a benefit or to injure or defraud another; to be a representative of some person or organization and does an act in such false capacity with intent to obtain a benefit or to injure or defraud another; or to be another person by Internet website or electronic means with intent to obtain a benefit or injure or defraud another, or by such communication falsely represents himself or herself to be a public officer or public employee to induce another person to submit to such authority or act in reliance on such false representation. Provides that the trier of fact may infer that a person is falsely representing himself or herself to be a public officer or a public employee or an official or employee of the federal government if the person wears or displays without authority any uniform, badge, insignia, or facsimile thereof by which such public officer or public employee or official or employee of the federal government is lawfully distinguished, or if the person falsely expresses by his or her words or actions that he or she is a public officer or public employee or official or employee of the federal government or is acting with approval or authority of a public agency or department and so acts with intent to induce another to submit to such false official authority, to solicit funds or to otherwise cause another person to act in reliance upon that false representation.
Title
CRIM CD-FALSE PERSONATION
Sponsors
Sen. Ira Silverstein [D] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Sen. William Haine [D] | Sen. Mike Jacobs [D] |
Rep. Sidney Mathias [R] | Rep. Keith Farnham [D] | Rep. Jim Sacia [R] | Rep. Fred Crespo [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-28 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0219 |
2011-07-28 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-07-28 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2011-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-05 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jim Sacia |
2011-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2011-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2011-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-04-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Silverstein |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2011-03-09 | Senate | To Criminal Law Subcommittee on Special Issues |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Held in Criminal Law |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2011-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Mu |
2011-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 17-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 32-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |