IL SB0060 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on July 4 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Township Code. Provides that a township board may establish a fair and reasonable rate (currently, rate or charge) for users of waterworks systems and sewerage systems and a fair and reasonable connection charge for each new user. Provides that mayors or presidents of municipalities and customers must choose the independent entity to conduct the cost study, order the cost study, and pay for the cost study they requested. Further provides that the cost study must include an examination of residential and commercial connection charges for the waterworks system or sewerage system, whichever applies, in at least 30 units of local government in Illinois with a similar number of customers as are connected to the township's waterworks system and sewerage system (currently, examination of water main and sewer connection charges in neighboring units of local government or units of local government similar in size or population). Removes provisions concerning written quotes and payments for cost studies. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TWP CD-WATER AND SEWER RATES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-31SenateSent to the Governor
2017-07-04SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-07-04SenateSenate Concurs
2017-07-04SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 050-000-000
2017-07-04SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 050-000-000
2017-07-04Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-07-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-07-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-07-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-07-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link
2017-07-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-07-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link
2017-07-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-07-01SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
2017-06-30SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Terry Link
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 005-002-000
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 005-002-000
2017-06-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government
2017-06-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-06-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-06-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-06-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-06-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - June 28, 2017
2017-06-27SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2017-06-26House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-027-001
2017-06-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-06-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 006-000-000
2017-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee
2017-05-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 005-001-000
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-04HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass Local Government; 006-000-000
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-02-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-10SenatePrefiled with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
601205-140Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=60&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0060.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0060eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0060enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0060ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0060ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0060_04272017_091000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0060_06262017_004000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0060_07042017_006001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0060_07042017_006000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback