IL SB0056 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that provisions requiring boards of review and the Property Tax Appeal Board to consider compulsory sales for the purpose of revising and correcting assessments apply only to complaints affecting assessments for assessment years 2011 through 2016. Provides that boards of review shall consider compulsory sales in the equalization process only in assessment years 2011 through 2016. Provides that, beginning on the effective date of the amendatory Act, transfer declarations are no longer required to state whether the transfer is pursuant to compulsory sale. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-COMPULSORY SALES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-assigned to Revenue |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 16-183 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 16-55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 16-65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 17-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 31-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=56&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0056.htm |