IL SB0055 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections concerning the sentence for first degree murder. Provides that if the defendant had not attained the age of 18 at the time of the commission of the murder, but is found guilty of first degree murder and certain aggravating factors are present, the court shall sentence the defendant to a term of imprisonment of not less than 60 years and not more than 100 years, or to a term of natural life imprisonment. Eliminates provision that requires the court to sentence a defendant to a term of natural life imprisonment if the defendant is a person who, at the time of the commission of the murder, had attained the age of 17 or more and is found guilty of murdering an individual under 12 years of age. Eliminates provision that requires the court to sentence a defendant to a term of natural life imprisonment if the defendant is a person who, at the time of the commission of the murder, had not attained the age of 17, and is found guilty of murdering a person under 12 years of age and the murder is committed during the course of aggravated criminal sexual assault, criminal sexual assault, or aggravated kidnaping.
Title
CD CORR-FIRST DEGREE MURDER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-02-13 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Restorative Justice |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-8-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=55&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB0055.htm |