IL SB0047 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Residential Real Property Transfer on Death Instrument Act. Renames the Act the "Real Property Transfer on Death Instrument Act". Changes the definitions of "owner" and "person". Defines "real property". Changes references to "residential real estate property" to references to "real property". Permits the transfer of real property by a transfer on death instrument to a trustee of a trust under certain circumstances even if the trust is subject to amendment, modification, revocation, or termination. Provides that a transfer on death instrument may not be admitted to probate as the will of the owner or as a codicil thereto. Provides that a transfer on death instrument does not need to state consideration or the addresses of the beneficiaries. Provides that if the transfer on death instrument is not witnessed by at least 2 credible witnesses, it is void. Provides that if a beneficiary attests to the execution of the transfer on death instrument, the interest transferred to that beneficiary is void as to that beneficiary. Changes the rules under which real property that is subject to a transfer on death instrument is transferred. Provides that a transfer on death instrument may be renounced by the owner's surviving spouse. Makes other changes to provisions regarding: rights of creditors; limitations; and preparation of a transfer on death instrument or its revocation. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROPERTY TRANSFER ON DEATH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-26SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-26HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000
2021-05-21HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-13HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-13HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 015-000-000
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2021-04-26HouseArrived in House
2021-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 22, 2021
2021-04-21SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
2021-04-14SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
2021-04-07SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-01-29SenateFirst Reading
2021-01-29SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
755271Amended CodeCitation Text
7552710Amended CodeCitation Text
7552715Amended CodeCitation Text
7552720Amended CodeCitation Text
7552721New CodeSee Bill Text
7552730Amended CodeCitation Text
7552735Amended CodeCitation Text
7552740Amended CodeCitation Text
7552745Amended CodeCitation Text
755275Amended CodeCitation Text
7552760Amended CodeCitation Text
7552765Amended CodeCitation Text
7552766New CodeSee Bill Text
7552775Amended CodeCitation Text
7552785Amended CodeCitation Text
7552790Amended CodeCitation Text
7552795Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback