IL SB0043 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Removes language repealing a provision concerning delivery and carry out of mixed drinks on January 3, 2024.
Title
LIQUOR-MIXED DRINK DELIVERY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-02-16 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Liquor |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-01-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Prefiled with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 6-28.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=43&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB0043.htm |