IL SB0041 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-08 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Finance Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning required reports and accounts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI-CONVEY INTEREST REVENUES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-08SenateTotal Veto Stands
2017-10-24SenatePlaced Calendar Total Veto
2017-08-25SenateGovernor Vetoed
2017-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 049-004-001
2017-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2017-05-26SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2017-05-26SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 26, 2017
2017-05-25SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-044-000
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-16HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-11HouseArrived in House
2017-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 038-012-002
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Cullerton
2017-05-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-02-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 8, 2017
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 25, 2017
2017-01-24SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2017-01-18SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301052Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback