IL SB0040 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Fire Department Promotion Act, the Counties Code, and the Illinois Municipal Code. Removes restrictions on the availability to receive a veteran's preference promotion if the person has already received a promotion from based on a veteran's preference. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VETERAN'S PREFERENCE PROMOTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Local Government; 007-002-000
2019-02-20SenatePostponed - Local Government
2019-02-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-01-30SenateAssigned to Local Government
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5074255Amended CodeCitation Text
5553-14021Amended CodeCitation Text
65510-1-16Amended CodeCitation Text
65510-2.1-11Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback