IL SB0035 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
IMMIGRATION SAFE ZONES ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 35 N: 16 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 53 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 60 N: 54 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 53 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 60 N: 54 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 035-016-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-004-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 062-053-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable |
2018-05-30 | House | Motion Prevailed 060-054-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-05-23 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-05-23 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-18 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-05-18 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Human Services Committee; 007-005-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 031-016-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-004-000 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 7, 2018 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2017 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 25, 2017 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 80 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |