IL SB0032 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that no more than 30% of a downstate police or downstate fire pension fund's assets may be invested in debt obligations of corporations subject to specified conditions. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-ART 3 & 4 INVESTMENTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08SenateSession Sine Die
2011-03-18SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2011-03-17SenatePostponed - Pensions and Investments
2011-03-10SenatePostponed - Pensions and Investments
2011-03-03SenatePostponed - Pensions and Investments
2011-01-27SenateAssigned to Pensions and Investments
2011-01-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2011-01-27SenateFirst Reading
2011-01-27SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chris Lauzen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.35New CodeSee Bill Text
4051-113.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback