IL SB0028 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that for a pupil of legal school age and in kindergarten or any of grades 1 through 12, a day of attendance shall be counted only for sessions of not less than 5 clock hours of school work per day under direct supervision of (i) teachers or (ii) non-teaching personnel or volunteer personnel when engaging in non-teaching duties and supervising in instances specified under the Code; provides for exceptions. Makes conforming changes, including in the Vocational Academies Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-DAILY PUPIL ATTENDANCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0012
2019-06-07SenateEffective Date July 1, 2019
2019-06-07SenateGovernor Approved
2019-05-24SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-01HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-27HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-03-27HouseArrived in House
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bertino-Tarrant
2019-03-20SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2019-03-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000
2019-03-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2019-03-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-02-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 7, 2019
2019-02-06SenateSecond Reading
2019-01-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 31, 2019
2019-01-30SenateDo Pass Education; 016-000-000
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Education
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10543310Amended CodeCitation Text
105510-19Amended CodeCitation Text
105510-19.05New CodeSee Bill Text
105510-20.56Amended CodeCitation Text
105513B-45Amended CodeCitation Text
105513B-50.5Amended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.66bAmended CodeCitation Text
105529-6.3Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback