IL SB0026 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a county or municipality may not use an automated traffic law enforcement system to provide recorded images of a motor vehicle for the purpose of issuing violations to persons driving a motor vehicle who enter an intersection to turn right against a red signal indication. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-AUTOMATED RED LIGHT ENF
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James T. Meeks |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Carole Pankau |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine J. Johnson |
2011-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzi Schmidt |
2011-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Shane Cultra |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Johnson |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Lauzen |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Prefiled with Secretary by Sen. Dan Duffy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-208.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=26&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB0026.htm |