IL SB0022 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Act may be referred to as the Religious Equity Act. Allows for the sale of motor vehicles on any 6 days of the week chosen by the business owner (instead of on any day but Sunday). Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-DEALER CAR SALES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (TR) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled with Secretary by Sen. Jim Oberweis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 5-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-102.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=22&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0022.htm |