IL SB0017 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-09 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC EMPLOYEE BENEFITS-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno
2017-01-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-01-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-01-09SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 10, 2017
2017-01-09SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-01-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 10, 2017
2015-10-10SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2015-10-10SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2015-10-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015
2015-05-15SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
2015-04-24SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015
2015-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015
2015-04-15SenateSecond Reading
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
2015-03-26SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2015-03-18SenateAssigned to Executive
2015-02-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2015-01-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-01-15SenateFirst Reading
2015-01-15SenatePrefiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4051-101.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback