IL SB0006 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 005-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Makes appropriations to agencies for costs incurred prior to July 1, 2017. Effective immediately, but this Act does not take effect at all unless Senate Bills 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, and 13 of the 100th General Assembly become law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$FY17 VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 21 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 005-000-000
2017-05-25HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-25HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 005-000-000
2017-05-25HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-25HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 005-000-000
2017-05-25HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Appropriations-Human Services Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-25HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 005-000-000
2017-05-25HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Appropriations-General Services Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-25HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 005-000-000
2017-05-25HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-24HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-05-24HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-24HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-24HouseArrived in House
2017-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 033-023-002
2017-05-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 8 Adopted; Steans
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 7 Adopted; Steans
2017-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 8 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 7 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 8 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 8 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-23SenateMotion to Reconsider Vote - Prevails
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 7 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 7 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-17SenateMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 031-021-003
2017-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 6 Adopted; Steans
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Steans
2017-05-17SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-05-17SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 6 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateMotion Prevailed
2017-02-28SenateMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-02-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 042-016-001
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; J. Cullerton
2017-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; J. Cullerton
2017-02-28SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-02-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2017-01-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 25, 2017
2017-01-24SenateSecond Reading
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 24, 2017
2017-01-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Appropriations I
2017-01-24SenatePostponed - Appropriations I
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations I
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Appropriations I
2017-01-12SenateAssigned to Appropriations I
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/PDF/10000SB0006.pdf
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/PDF/10000SB0006eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/PDF/10000SB0006sam001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/PDF/10000SB0006sam002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/PDF/10000SB0006sam003.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/PDF/10000SB0006sam004.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/PDF/10000SB0006sam005.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/PDF/10000SB0006sam006.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/PDF/10000SB0006sam007.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/PDF/10000SB0006sam008.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0006_02282017_005000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0006_05172017_007000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0006_05232017_016000T.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback