IL HR1494 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-13)
Status: Passed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-13)
Status: Passed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Opposes the consideration or passage of any income tax increase on the people of Illinois during any "lame duck" special session that may be called to meet on or after January 1, 2017 at any time prior to January 11, 2017.
Title
LAME DUCK - NO INCOME TAX
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2016-11-30 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2016-11-30 | House | Resolution Adopted 087-012-000 |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2016-11-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2016-11-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-000 |
2016-11-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-11-29 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2016-11-29 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-11-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2016-11-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2016-11-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2016-11-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2016-11-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2016-11-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2016-11-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2016-11-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2016-11-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-11-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2016-11-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2016-11-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-11-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1494&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR1494.htm |