IL HR1319 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges Congress to amend 28 U.S.C. 225 to provide that post-conviction relief for federal offenses be available in cases if exculpatory evidence has been withheld from a person and either the person was convicted and sentenced to probation or the person has been released from federal incarceration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

POST CONVICTION RELIEF-FEDERAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-03HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2016-06-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-06-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback